SOUTH ZEAL RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 268518
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 02 September 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 11 September 2020 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 01 September 2021 366 days late Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 29 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 12 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 12 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required