Financial history SOUTH ZEAL RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 268518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £12.56k £14.38k £27.14k £14.41k £9.83k
Total expenditure £10.10k £11.50k £10.96k £27.82k £17.85k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £950 N/A £10.00k N/A