BEMBRIDGE FRIENDSHIP CIRCLE

Charity number: 268522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £5.96k £10.78k £9.28k £9.50k £21.24k
Total expenditure £7.34k £5.19k £5.75k £7.33k £3.38k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.00k N/A N/A N/A