BARTS RENAL PATIENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable purposes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 December 1974: Standard registration
- BARTLEN KIDNEY MACHINE PATIENTS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TINA HARLOW | Trustee |
|
||||
SPENCER MACDONALD | Trustee |
|
||||
MICHELLE WICKWAR | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £101 | £0 | £15 | £60 | £20 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 March 2022 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 February 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 9TH NOVEMBER 1969 AS AMENDED 17TH FEBRUARY 1985 AND BY SCHEMES OF THE 14TH JUNE 1985 AND 29TH MARCH 1988
Charitable objects
1). TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC AND PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO ALL FORMS OF KIDNEY DISORDERS INCLUDING THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE SERVICE OF RENAL TRANSPLANTATION AND TO PUBLICISE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.2). TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF DIALYSIS AND OTHER EQUIPMENT USED IN KIDNEY RESEARCH OR TREATMENT.3). TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM KIDNEY AND RENAL DISEASES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
62 BONNINGTONS
BRENTWOOD
CM13 2TN
- Phone:
- 01277210584
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window