THE ANCHORAGE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 268679
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 February 2020 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 09 February 2020 9 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 14 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2016 29 December 2016 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 January 2017 32 days late Download