Accounts and annual returns 2ND CHELMSFORD (SPRINGFIELD) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 268683
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 08 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 11 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required