Accounts and annual returns THE LAW SOCIETY CHARITY

Charity number: 268736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 16 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 16 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 28 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 21 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 21 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 05 August 2019 181 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 05 August 2019 181 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 29 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 29 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window