THE LAW SOCIETY CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support education of the public in legal matters and members of the profession in the interest of the public. To support charities whose principal aims are to support members of the profession in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 December 1974: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE LAW SOCIETY TRUSTEES LTD | Trustee | 04 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.94k | £58.55k | £111.77k | £20.20k | £36.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.78k | £20.00k | £64.91k | £51.98k | £37.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11TH DECEMBER 1974
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR CHARITABLE OBJECT OR PURPOSE OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OBJECTS OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 4 & 5 OF DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11TH DECEMBER 1974)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE LAW SOCIETY
100-113 CHANCERY LANE
LONDON
WC2A 1PL
- Phone:
- 02072 421 222
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window