Claygate Primary School Parents Association

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the charity is to advance the education of the pupils at the school by providing and assisting in the provision of facilities for education, not normally provided by the Local Education Authority.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Surrey
Governance
- 18 February 1975: Standard registration
- CLAYGATE COUNTY SCHOOLS PARENTS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emily Tye | Chair | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lee Antony Wateridge | Trustee | 09 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Natasha Schoeler | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.61k | £28.37k | £29.42k | £41.82k | £30.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.10k | £59.20k | £39.39k | £41.43k | £36.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 07 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 07 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 21 July 2022 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 21 July 2022 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 13 July 2021 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 13 July 2021 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24TH OCTOBER 1974 as amended on 19 Oct 2023 as amended on 19 Oct 2023 as amended on 27 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL AND AS ANCILLARY THERETO AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS AIM THE ASSOCIATION MAY:- (A) FOSTER MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL, AND (B) ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT.
Area of benefit
THE CATCHMENT AREA OF CLAYGATE COUNTY SCHOOLS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Claygate Primary School
Foley Road
Claygate
Esher
KT10 0NB
- Phone:
- 01372 465348
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window