Financial history HENLEY ART AND CRAFTS GUILD

Charity number: 268947
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022
Total gross income £21.11k £21.14k £21.56k £6.58k £23.65k
Total expenditure £22.32k £21.19k £22.68k £3.80k £15.41k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A