ST STEPHENS COTTAGES RUMBURGH TRUST

Charity number: 268999
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 08 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 08 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 18 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 18 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 10 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 10 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 01 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 01 February 2018 On time Download