Financial history PETER SAMUEL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 269065
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £116.50k £111.56k £132.46k £87.92k £218.14k
Total expenditure £128.53k £260.45k £231.65k £69.70k £217.20k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A