Accounts and annual returns THE PAT AND CHARLES SONABEND CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 269087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 19 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 24 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 24 May 2020 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 05 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 13 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required