Financial history ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY OF THE REVEREND WILLIAM SMART

Charity number: 269174
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £311 £317 £324 £330 £337
Total expenditure £311 £317 £318 £330 £337
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A