Governing document AFRICAN WELFARE LIMITED
Charity number: 269256
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 FEBRUARY 1975 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 12 MARCH 1975, 23 APRIL 1975, 13 NOVEMBER 1975 AND 23 SEPTEMBER 1976
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AMONG PERSONS IN THE TRANSKEI AND JOHANNESBURG, SOUTH AFRICA, IN LESOTHO AND IN SWAZILAND.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
SEE OBJECTS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.