ALVESTON C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT/TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 269297
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £1.43k £15.83k £14.39k £7.28k £3.51k
Total expenditure £6.57k £23.89k £8.86k £4.77k £8.98k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A