Trustees THE HAMPSHIRE BUILDINGS PRESERVATION TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 269378
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHARLES DENNIS FRASER-FLEMING Chair 21 May 2013
None on record
PETER CHARLES GOODSHIP Trustee 02 December 2022
None on record
ANDREW ROBERT MASON Trustee 15 November 2019
WHITCHURCH SILK MILL TRUST
Received: On time
WYMERING MANOR TRUST
Received: On time
SARAH ANNE ROBERTS Trustee 15 November 2019
None on record
DAVINIA FAY POTTERTON Trustee 15 November 2019
None on record
David Hubbard Trustee 04 November 2016
None on record
Wayne Irish Trustee 21 May 2013
AGE CONCERN, EASTLEIGH TOWN
Received: On time
QE2 ACTIVITY CENTRE
Received: On time
EASTLEIGH AND DISTRICT LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY
Received: On time
MAYOR OF EASTLEIGH CHARITY APPEAL FUND
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF NORTH STONEHAM AND BASSETT,SOUTHAMPTON
Received: On time
PHILIP ANTHONY TURNER Trustee 01 January 2013
None on record
ELEANOR BELL Trustee
None on record
Dr CELIA MARY CLARK Trustee
THE OMEGA CENTRE TRUST
Recently registered
WYMERING MANOR TRUST
Received: On time
BILL FERGIE Trustee
THE BASINGSTOKE CHARITIES
Received: On time
ALDWORTH'S EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
NICK WALKER Trustee
PORTCHESTER PARISH HALL
Received: On time