WILLIAM ARTHUR STEPHEN MILES WILL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In accordance with the terms of the Trust , the available income has been paid at the Trustee's discretion to 5 charities.The Trustees are satisfied that these purposes remain charitable and for the public benefit. The Trustees have complied with the duty in Section 4 of the Charities Act 2006 to have due regard to public benefit guidance published by the Charity Commission.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 February 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 July 1975: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LLOYDS BANK PRIVATE BANKING LIMITED | Trustee | 24 September 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 03/02/2020 | 03/02/2021 | 03/02/2022 | 03/02/2023 | 03/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.33k | £2.04k | £1.59k | £1.78k | £2.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.46k | £1.98k | £1.82k | £1.46k | £2.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 February 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 February 2023 | 28 May 2024 | 177 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 February 2022 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 February 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 February 2020 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED 9TH APRIL 1973
Charitable objects
THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF ANY LEGALLY CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS WHERESOEVER SITUATE BUT THE TESTATOR REQUESTS THAT THE ANNUAL INCOME BE APPLIED EQUALLY BETWEEN THE FOLLOWING:- DOCTOR BARNARDO'S, THE BRITISH DEAF ASSOCIATION, THE ROYAL NATIONAL INSTITUTE FOR THE BLIND AND CANCER RELIEF MACMILLAN FUND
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lloyds Banking Group
City Park
The Droveway
HOVE
East Sussex
BN3 7AU
- Phone:
- 03453000304
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window