FRIENDS OF RYE HARBOUR NATURE RESERVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports all aspects of the management of the Rye Harbour Nature Reserve in East Sussex by providing finance, volunteer assistance, staff accommodation and advice. Meetings and events for members of the charity are held to assist with fund raising.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- East Sussex
Governance
- 03 July 1975: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Barry Yates | Trustee | 11 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Bentley | Trustee | 03 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Yates | Trustee | 03 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Mary George | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALAN JOHN MARTIN | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Claire Bayntun | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN GEORGE MASTERS | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Tomlinson | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
LINDA MARIE WREN | Trustee | 20 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Victor Robert Baker | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK FRANCIS BONHAM | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £119.85k | £128.74k | £82.35k | £90.39k | £70.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £369.28k | £154.55k | £84.22k | £48.55k | £70.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 MAY 1974, AS AMENDED 8 MAY 1993, 17 SEPTEMBER 1994, 11 JANUARY 1995, 7 OCTOBER 2000 AND 29 SEPTEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE RYE HARBOUR NATURE RESERVE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE. (FOR DETAILS, SEE CLAUSE 2 OF CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
AREA COVERED BY RYE HARBOUR NATURE RESERVE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rye Harbour Discovery Centre
Rye Harbour Road
Rye Harbour
RYE
East Sussex
TN31 7FW
- Phone:
- 01797360960
- Email:
- jvr.baker52@aol.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window