Accounts and annual returns THE SOCIETY OF CLINICAL PSYCHIATRISTS RESEARCH FUND

Charity number: 269593
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 15 July 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2022 28 September 2023 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 20 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 19 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 23 September 2020 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1421 days