Financial history DEPTFORD ACTION GROUP FOR THE ELDERLY

Charity number: 269672
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £112.00k £117.57k £49.00k £49.25k £93.31k
Total expenditure £141.76k £130.06k £45.54k £46.65k £76.99k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £67.67k