MIND ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We were founded in 1901. We exist to further philosophy by publishing the academic journal Mind and by funding philosophical events and research of the highest quality. Please note that we have NO CONNECTION WHATEVER with the mental health charity MIND, founded in 1946.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 September 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Helen Beebee | Trustee | 12 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Megan Blomfield | Trustee | 12 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Christoph Kelp | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mark Sinclair | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Al-Quassim Amir Cassam | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Luke John Elson | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Louise Mary Hanson | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alix-Aurelia Cohen | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jonathan Webber | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eliot Michaelson | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Anna Marmodoro | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £221.97k | £219.36k | £209.34k | £210.06k | £190.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £197.50k | £189.93k | £192.09k | £266.12k | £136.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07/07/1978 AS AMENDED ON 11/07/1987 AS AMENDED ON 09/07/1988 AS AMENDED ON 05/11/2012
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF PHILOSOPHY.RE5
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Hannington Road
BOURNEMOUTH
BH7 6JT
- Phone:
- 02380594541
- Email:
- MindAssoc@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window