JEWISH MEDICAL ASSOCIATION (UK)

Charity number: 269752
Charity reporting is overdue by 182 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 182 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 182 days
Annual return 31 July 2019 11 October 2020 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 11 October 2020 133 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 02 October 2019 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 02 October 2019 124 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 08 July 2018 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 08 July 2018 38 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 06 July 2017 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 06 July 2017 36 days late Download