JEWISH MEDICAL ASSOCIATION (UK)

Charity number: 269752
Charity reporting is overdue by 190 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019
Total gross income £35.53k £41.45k £42.92k £39.08k £36.08k
Total expenditure £26.30k £42.02k £41.81k £35.23k £45.72k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A