GEORGE BUTCHER MEMORIAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Charity are to assist in the advancement, education and training of students, apprentices, school leavers, univeristy graduates and other persons under the age of 30 years from the Town of Baldock and neighbouring villages. The Grants to be used towards the provisions of text books, fees for tuition and entrolment for educational courses, tools and implements of the trade.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 05 September 1975: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
michael Muir | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev anthony Ronald ruffell | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOSEPH WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEVIN SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILLIAN MARGARET HOPKINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £624 | £627 | £623 | £680 | £1.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £600 | £350 | £675 | £550 | £1.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14TH JULY 1975 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 31 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN THE ADVANCEMENT, EDUCATION AND TRAINING ("THE BENEFITS") OF STUDENTS, APPRENTICES, SCHOOL LEAVERS, UNIVERSITY GRADUATES AND OTHER PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 30 YEARS ("THE BENEFICIARIES") FROM THE TOWN OF BALDOCK AND NEIGHBOURING VILLAGES AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE THE TRUSTEES, MAY AS AND WHEN THEY THINK FIT, OUT OF THE INCOME ARISING FROM THE CAPITAL FUND HEREINAFTER MENTIONED MAKE GIFTS OR LOANS IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS:- (I) TOWARDS THE PROVISIONS OF TEXT BOOKS, FEES FOR TUITION AND ENROLMENT FOR EDUCATIONAL COURSES, TOOLS AND IMPLEMENTS OF TRADE, THE PURCHASE OF ANY OTHER ARTICLES AND/OR THE PAYMENT OF ANY EXPENSES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS IN RELATION TO AND FOR THE BENEFITS OF ONE OR MORE BENEFICIARIES FOR A PROFESSION, VOCATION, TRADE AND GENERAL FUTURE EMPLOYMENT (II) TOWARDS THE PROVISION TO BENEFICIARIES OF BURSARIES AND/OR SCHOLARSHIPS FOR FURTHER EDUCATION TO BE AWARDED IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULES TO BE ESTABLISHED BY THE TRUSTEES AND ON THE TERMS HEREINAFTER CONTAINED.
Area of benefit
TOWN OF BALDOCK AND NEIGHBOURING VILLAGES
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 KYRKEBY
LETCHWORTH GARDEN CITY
SG6 2PB
- Phone:
- 0146264650
- Email:
- ANNEMAL86@LIVE.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window