BRAHMA KUMARIS WORLD SPIRITUAL UNIVERSITY (UK)

Charity number: 269971
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 02 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 22 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 22 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 23 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 26 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 26 September 2016 On time Download