BRAHMA KUMARIS WORLD SPIRITUAL UNIVERSITY (UK)

Charity number: 269971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.09m £2.03m £3.33m £4.10m £3.59m
Total expenditure £2.37m £2.40m £2.30m £2.27m £1.68m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.01m £1.89m £3.24m £3.99m £3.06m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £48.82k £94.27k £68.15k £81.51k £62.96k
Income - Other £34.32k £44.38k £21.27k £25.56k £468.46k
Income - Legacies £21.80k £13.18k £245.35k £91.01k £132.77k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.37m £2.40m £2.30m £2.27m £1.68m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £237.42k £294.60k £290.65k £303.71k £86.02k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0