PLUDDS AND DISTRICT VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A village hall to provide social and leisure activities, education, and to enhance community spirit of local residents, regardless of creed, gender, ability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £6,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 01 October 1975: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MEGAN LEWIS | Chair | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARION BARBER | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Laura Mason | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL PRIDE | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
alison lewis | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.07k | £1.25k | £9.42k | £40.29k | £19.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.47k | £4.78k | £5.65k | £27.66k | £31.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | £1.50k | £6.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 August 2023 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 13TH JANUARY 1973
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF RUARDEAN, PLUDDS AND DISTRICT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF RUARDEAN PLUDDS AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pludds Village Hall
Ashdene Road
The Pludds
Ruardean
GL17 9UQ
- Phone:
- 01594 860466
- Email:
- meeglewis@googlemail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window