ALTERNATIVE THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 270080
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.63m £4.24m £2.05m £2.55m £2.02m
Total expenditure £2.00m £1.66m £2.49m £2.63m £2.64m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.20m £3.05m £773.85k £698.78k £642.28k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.84m £4.01m £0 £1.61m £1.02m
Income - Other trading activities £361.04k £23.81k £357.29k £395.22k £347.48k
Income - Charitable activities £419.19k £213.44k £481.14k £546.48k £651.30k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £906 £1.08k £155 £658 £732
Income - Other £0 £0 £1.22m £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.69m £1.53m £2.27m £2.24m £2.28m
Expenditure - Raising funds £310.60k £128.97k £113.65k £110.68k £99.54k
Expenditure - Governance £38.08k £41.40k £43.01k £44.06k £30.96k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £112.54k £281.82k £255.28k