ALTERNATIVE THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 270080
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SIMON JOHNSON Chair None on record
Niove Janis Trustee 12 March 2019 None on record
Catherine Score Trustee 02 October 2018 None on record
STEPHEN MARC PIDCOCK Trustee 04 June 2018 None on record
Simon Dowson-Collins Trustee 30 June 2015 None on record
RAJIV PARKASH Trustee 05 August 2019 None on record
Lynette Margaret Linton Trustee 31 December 2018 None on record
NIKE JONAH Trustee 08 March 2016
BIRMINGHAM CONTEMPORARY MUSIC GROUP Received: On time
THE ROYAL AFRICAN SOCIETY Received: On time
Uzma Hasan Trustee 19 May 2021 None on record
Kathryn Marten Trustee 22 June 2016 None on record