BELLEVILLE PTA

Charity number: 270097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £61.57k £48.48k £56.64k £57.69k £71.74k
Total expenditure £33.32k £95.35k £39.30k £30.65k £22.53k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A