SUBUD PUBLICATIONS INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 270159
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £69.18k £66.27k £60.39k £68.34k £85.33k
Total expenditure £59.45k £54.57k £58.04k £56.91k £53.81k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A