FRIENDS OF TAVISTOCK AND SUMMERHILL SCHOOL

Charity number: 270168
Charity reporting is 646 days late
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 Not yet received
280 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not yet received
280 days overdue
Annual return 31 July 2018 Not yet received
646 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not yet received
646 days overdue
Annual return 31 July 2017 08 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 27 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2015 28 January 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)