FRIENDS OF TAVISTOCK AND SUMMERHILL SCHOOL

Charity number: 270168
Charity reporting is overdue by 691 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/07/2013 31/07/2014 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017
Total gross income £5.22k £11.69k £19.96k £1.70k £0
Total expenditure £10.51k £8.21k £14.72k £5.38k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A £0