THE CRONDALL SOCIETY

Charity number: 270257
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.18k £4.02k £13.03k £10.90k £8.42k
Total expenditure £4.81k £3.53k £6.61k £16.10k £3.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A