THE SUMRAY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 270270
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 23 March 2021 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 18 June 2020 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 18 June 2019 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 21 February 2018 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 09 May 2017 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required