THE BRITISH KIDNEY PATIENT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 270288
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.87m £2.32m £2.40m £1.83m £1.35m
Total expenditure £3.06m £2.81m £3.33m £3.95m £3.30m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.03m £1.43m £1.50m £929.39k £685.79k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £42.87k
Income - Charitable activities £21.82k £56.52k £0 £32.52k £42.87k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £248.78k
Income - Investment £824.91k £827.16k £907.15k £870.49k £616.92k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £850.68k £1.28m £1.15m £520.18k £248.78k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.71m £1.18m £2.87m £2.47m £2.80m
Expenditure - Raising funds £321.43k £397.99k £458.53k £518.53k £504.02k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £56.87k £86.10k £111.95k £105.02k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £1.42m £0 £1.06m
Expenditure - Investment management £160.21k £175.31k £199.47k £194.92k £0
Expenditure - Other £1.03m £1.23m £0 £964.23k £0