Accounts and annual returns THE LANCASTRIAN CHAPTER BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 270328
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 19 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 July 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 July 2020 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 04 January 2020 188 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 02 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required