BANSTEAD MUSICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 270480
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 17 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 29 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 24 June 2018 06 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 24 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 19 June 2017 20 June 2018 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 19 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 20 June 2016 29 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 June 2016 29 August 2016 On time Download