BANSTEAD MUSICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 270480
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jenny Miller-Slights Trustee 13 March 2017 None on record
Margaret Stevens Trustee 13 March 2017 None on record
Marianne Adams Trustee 04 July 2019 None on record
Alan Clark Trustee 07 July 2016 None on record
Rosemairi Evison Trustee 27 March 2018 None on record
June Parsons Chair 03 July 2014 None on record
Alison Jones Trustee 01 July 2014 None on record
STEPHEN OLIVER Trustee None on record