Trustees CHARINCO COMMON INVESTMENT FUND

Charity number: 270540
Charity is a Common Investment Fund

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN HESKETT Chair 10 March 2014
CHARISHARE COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
Charity is a Common Investment Fund
CHARISHARE RESTRICTED COMMON INVESTMENT
Charity is a Common Investment Fund
Andrew Brettell Trustee 23 February 2015
CHARISHARE COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
Charity is a Common Investment Fund
CHARISHARE RESTRICTED COMMON INVESTMENT
Charity is a Common Investment Fund
JEREMY THOMPSON Trustee 12 March 2014
CHARISHARE COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
Charity is a Common Investment Fund
CHARISHARE RESTRICTED COMMON INVESTMENT
Charity is a Common Investment Fund
BNY MELLON TRUST & DEPOSITARY (UK) LIMITED Trustee 08 March 2013
CHARITRAK COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
Charity is a Common Investment Fund
ARMED FORCES COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
Charity is a Common Investment Fund
CHARISHARE COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
Charity is a Common Investment Fund
CHARISHARE RESTRICTED COMMON INVESTMENT
Charity is a Common Investment Fund
DAVID LOUGH Trustee 23 May 2011
CHARISHARE COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
Charity is a Common Investment Fund
CHARISHARE RESTRICTED COMMON INVESTMENT
Charity is a Common Investment Fund
ROBERT RENTON POPE Trustee
CHARISHARE COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
Charity is a Common Investment Fund
CHARISHARE RESTRICTED COMMON INVESTMENT
Charity is a Common Investment Fund
Julian Arthur Vaughan Smith Trustee
CHARISHARE COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
Charity is a Common Investment Fund
CHARISHARE RESTRICTED COMMON INVESTMENT
Charity is a Common Investment Fund
THE PRINCESS ANNE'S CHARITIES
Received: On time
LEEDS CASTLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
BLACKROCK FUND MANAGERS LIMITED Trustee
CHARITRAK COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
Charity is a Common Investment Fund
CHARISHARE RESTRICTED COMMON INVESTMENT
Charity is a Common Investment Fund
CHARIFAITH COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
Charity is a Common Investment Fund
ARMED FORCES COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
Charity is a Common Investment Fund
BLACKROCK CHARITIES FUNDS
Overdue by 55 days
CHARISHARE COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
Charity is a Common Investment Fund