Financial history THE KOREAN MISSION

Charity number: 270575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £7.06k £1.54k £1.24k £793 £698
Total expenditure £6.32k £1.37k £747 £186 £193
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A