THE SWIRE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 270726
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.76m £2.74m £3.86m £3.98m £5.09m
Total expenditure £4.03m £3.96m £3.78m £4.02m £4.26m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.50m £2.50m £2.75m £3.00m £4.19m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £259.39k £241.59k £247.77k £234.35k £248.13k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £741.17k £647.87k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.03m £3.96m £3.78m £4.02m £4.23m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 -£1.27k £0 £0 £32.34k
Expenditure - Governance £121.95k £105.91k £105.30k £128.29k £107.19k
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.48m £3.86m £3.67m £2.97m £3.29m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 -£1.27k £0 £0 £32.34k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0