Financial history FRIENDS OF MIR

Charity number: 270864
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 12/03/2017 12/03/2018 12/03/2019 12/03/2020 12/03/2021
Total gross income £1.18m £1.41m £1.74m £1.17m £1.90m
Total expenditure £1.19m £1.41m £1.74m £1.12m £1.98m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.18m £1.41m £1.74m £1.17m £1.90m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £5 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £951.09k £1.40m £1.74m £1.06m £1.95m
Expenditure - Raising funds £240.11k £5.99k £0 £58.76k £33.96k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £7.69k £80
Expenditure - Grants institution £920.56k £1.40m £1.74m £1.01m £1.89m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0