Accounts and annual returns ST LEONARDS AND ST IVES VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 270967
Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 29 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 29 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 13 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window