THE GUTHRIE ESSAME CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 271022
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £71.30k £13.96k £88.08k £7.57k £7.47k
Total expenditure £90.00k £1.00k £72.00k £0 £8.25k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A