WHIMPLE/BROADCLYST YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB

Charity number: 271103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 12 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 13 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 13 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 27 August 2019 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 27 August 2019 58 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 12 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 12 June 2018 On time Download