5TH NEWQUAY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 271112
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SHARON HOOTON Trustee 31 October 2011 None on record
Andrew John Nash Trustee 19 September 2017 None on record
David wright Trustee 09 January 2020
YOUNG PEOPLE CORNWALL Received: On time
PETER YOUNGMAN Trustee 30 October 2011 None on record
Cassandra Warman Trustee 11 January 2020 None on record