ANGMERING VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 271149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MRS G BURKIN Trustee 25 March 2014 None on record
Alison Margaret Reigate Trustee 11 April 2017 None on record
JOHN YATES Chair 25 March 2014
THE LAVINIA NORFOLK CENTRE CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Christine Mary Jones Trustee 07 October 2019 None on record
MRS J BLAKE Trustee 24 June 2014 None on record
MRS K YATES Trustee None on record
Janine Clark Trustee 11 April 2017 None on record
June Savory Trustee 27 March 2018
ANGMERING GREEN WOMEN'S INSTITUTE Received: On time
Anne Toms Trustee 11 April 2017 None on record
Alan Evans Trustee 28 July 2021 None on record