Trustees FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND CENTRAL TRUST

Charity number: 271151
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tamileniyal Joy Christy Sahadevan Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Rev Jabson Watson Trustee 10 May 2022
FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND SOUTHERN DIOCESAN SYNOD
Received: On time
Rev Geoffrey Edward Andow Trustee 10 May 2022
None on record
Rev Anthony Kieran Roberts Trustee 10 May 2022
None on record
Natalie Stenstrom Trustee 08 October 2019
None on record
Rev Mark Spiers Trustee 08 October 2019
None on record
RIGHT REVD PAUL NIGEL HUNT BSC, MSC Trustee 09 October 2018
FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND CONVOCATION CHARITY
Received: 12 days late
ST JUDE'S CHURCH, WALSALL
Received: On time
ST. ANDREW'S CHURCH, BENTLEY
Received: On time
FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND SOUTHERN DIOCESAN SYNOD
Received: On time
Rev Robert Wilson Trustee 09 October 2018
None on record
RIGHT REVEREND DOCTOR JOHN FENWICK BAMThPhDDD Trustee 27 September 2016
None on record
WILLIAM ALBERT CLEMENTS Trustee 17 October 2011
FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND CONVOCATION CHARITY
Received: 12 days late
ST JUDE'S CHURCH, WALSALL
Received: On time
FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND SOUTHERN DIOCESAN SYNOD
Received: On time
COLIN CHRISTOPHER MILLS Trustee
FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND CONVOCATION CHARITY
Received: 12 days late
TYNDALE MEMORIAL TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND SOUTHERN DIOCESAN SYNOD
Received: On time
CHRIST CHURCH WILLESBOROUGH
Received: On time
LESLEY ANN SECKER Trustee
TYNDALE MEMORIAL TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND SOUTHERN DIOCESAN SYNOD
Received: On time